Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB572 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Eltife S.B. No. 572
 (In the Senate - Filed February 13, 2015; February 23, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 March 31, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 31, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 572 By:  Eltife


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain title insurance policy liability and
 reinsurance requirements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2551.301, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2551.301.  MAXIMUM POLICY LIABILITY. (a)  Except as
 provided by Subsection (b), a title insurance company may [not]
 issue a title insurance policy on any real property located in this
 state involving a potential policy liability of not more than 50
 percent of the sum of the company's [capital stock and] surplus as
 regards policyholders and the company's statutory premium reserves
 as stated in the most recent annual statement of the company.
 (b)  A title insurance company may exceed the limit described
 by Subsection (a) if the excess liability is reinsured in due course
 in accordance with Section 2551.302, 2551.305, or 2551.3055 [an
 authorized title insurance company].
 SECTION 2.  Section 2551.302, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2551.302.  REQUIREMENTS FOR REINSURING POLICIES. A
 title insurance company may reinsure any of its policies and
 contracts issued on real property located in this state or on
 policies and contracts issued in this state under Chapter 2751, if:
 (1)  the reinsuring title insurance company is
 authorized to engage in business in this state under this title; or
 (2)  the title insurance company acquires reinsurance
 in accordance with Section 2551.305 or 2551.3055.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter G, Chapter 2551, Insurance Code, is
 amended by amending Section 2551.305 and adding Section 2551.3055
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2551.305.  [CERTAIN] REINSURANCE FROM NON-ADMITTED
 TITLE INSURER [ALLOWED].  [(a)]  Notwithstanding any other
 provision of this subchapter, a title insurance company may acquire
 reinsurance on an individual policy or facultative basis from a
 title insurance company not authorized to engage in the business of
 title insurance in this state if[:
 [(1)]  the title insurance company from which the
 reinsurance is acquired:
 (1) [(A)]  has a combined capital and surplus of at
 least $20 million as stated in the company's most recent annual
 statement preceding the acceptance of reinsurance; and
 (2) [(B)]  is domiciled in another state and is
 authorized to engage in the business of title insurance in one or
 more states[; and
 [(2)     the title insurance company acquiring
 reinsurance gives written notice to the department at least 30 days
 before acquiring the reinsurance, and the commissioner does not,
 before the expiration of the 30-day period and on the ground that
 the transaction may result in a hazardous financial condition,
 prohibit the title insurance company from obtaining reinsurance
 under this section.
 [(b)     The notice required under Subsection (a)(2) must
 provide sufficient information to enable the commissioner to
 evaluate the proposed transaction, including a summary of the
 significant terms of the reinsurance, the financial impact of the
 transaction on the title insurance company acquiring reinsurance,
 and the specific identity and state of domicile of each title
 insurance company from which reinsurance is acquired.
 [(c)     Notwithstanding any other provision of this
 subchapter, the department may, on application and hearing, permit
 a title insurance company to acquire reinsurance that does not
 comply with Subsection (a) on an individual policy or facultative
 basis from a title insurance company domiciled in another state and
 not authorized to engage in the business of title insurance in this
 state, if:
 [(1)     the company has exhausted the opportunity to
 acquire reinsurance from all other authorized title insurance
 companies; and
 [(2)     the title insurance company from which the
 reinsurance is acquired has a combined capital and surplus of at
 least $2 million as stated in its annual statement preceding the
 acceptance of reinsurance.
 [(d)     Notwithstanding any other provision of this
 subchapter, the department may, on application and hearing, permit
 a title insurance company, including an authorized reinsuring title
 insurance company, to retain an additional potential liability of
 not more than 40 percent of the company's capital stock and surplus
 as stated in the most recent annual statement of the company, if:
 [(1)     the company has exhausted the opportunity to
 acquire reinsurance under Subsection (c); and
 [(2)     the additional potential liability of the company
 is incurred only if the loss suffered by the insured under the
 policy exceeds the amount of insurance and reinsurance accepted by
 the company and its reinsuring title insurance companies under the
 other provisions of this subchapter].
 Sec. 2551.3055.  REINSURANCE FROM INSURER OTHER THAN TITLE
 INSURER. [(e)]  Notwithstanding any other provision of this
 subchapter, a title insurance company may obtain reinsurance by a
 reinsurance treaty or other reinsurance agreement from an assuming
 insurer with a financial strength rating of B+ or better from the A.
 M. Best Company, which reinsurance [that] meets the requirements of
 Subchapter C, Chapter 493, if the title insurance company has
 provided the department with notice [an affidavit] that:
 (1)  contains representations [facts] that
 [demonstrate] the title insurance company was unable after diligent
 effort to procure sufficient reinsurance from another title
 insurance company; and
 (2)  summarizes [states] the terms of the reinsurance
 treaty or other reinsurance agreement that the title insurance
 company will obtain.
 SECTION 4.  Section 2703.001(c), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  With respect to real property located in this state, a
 corporation may not issue any kind of title insurance coverage, any
 kind of guarantee, or reinsurance of a risk assumed under a title
 insurance policy, except as provided by Section 2551.305 or
 2551.3055 [2551.305(a)], unless the corporation is authorized to
 engage in the business of title insurance under this title and
 otherwise complies with this title. In engaging in the business of
 title insurance with respect to real property located in this
 state, the corporation shall comply with this title and rules
 described by Subsection (b), including when:
 (1)  issuing any kind of title insurance policy or an
 underwriting contract;
 (2)  reinsuring any portion of a risk assumed under a
 title insurance policy; and
 (3)  deleting a title insurance policy exclusion.
 SECTION 5.  (a)  Section 2551.301, Insurance Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to a title insurance policy issued
 on or after the effective date of this Act.  A title insurance
 policy issued before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law as it existed immediately before the effective date of this
 Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b)  Sections 2551.302 and 2551.305, Insurance Code, as
 amended by this Act, and Section 2551.3055, Insurance Code, as
 added by this Act, apply only to a reinsurance contract entered into
 by a title insurance company on or after the effective date of this
 Act.  A reinsurance contract entered into by a title insurance
 company before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 as it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *