Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB582 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/30/2015

                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 582
 (In the Senate - Filed February 16, 2015;
 February 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Health and Human Services; March 30, 2015, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 30, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 582 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to education and training programs for food handlers;
 eliminating the authority of a local health jurisdiction to require
 certain fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 437.0057, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1),
 (a-2), and (f) to read as follows:
 (a)  A county, a public health district, or the department
 may require certification [under Subchapter D, Chapter 438,] for
 each food handler who is employed by a food service establishment in
 which food is prepared on-site for sale to the public and which
 holds a permit issued by the county, the public health district, or
 the department.
 (a-1)  For purposes of this section, a food handler receives
 certification by successfully completing a food handler education
 or training program:
 (1)  accredited under Subchapter D, Chapter 438; or
 (2)  accredited by the American National Standards
 Institute.
 (a-2)  This section applies without regard to whether the
 food service establishment is at a fixed location or is a mobile
 food unit.
 (f)  The department may not adopt a rule, regulation, or
 policy that requires food service workers in the state to
 successfully complete a food handler training course. This
 subsection does not prevent the state, a county, or a public health
 district from imposing a food handler training course requirement
 in a location regulated by the state, county, or public health
 district.
 SECTION 2.  Section 437.0195(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  An individual who operates a cottage food production
 operation must have successfully completed a basic food safety
 education or training program for food handlers:
 (1)  accredited under Subchapter D, Chapter 438; or
 (2)  accredited by the American National Standards
 Institute.
 SECTION 3.  Section 437.0203(c), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  A person may conduct a cooking demonstration at a
 farmers' market only if:
 (1)  regardless of whether the demonstrator provides a
 sample of food to consumers[, the farmers' market that hosts the
 demonstration]:
 (A)  the [has an] establishment operator [with a
 valid certification under Subchapter D, Chapter 438,] supervising
 the demonstration has completed a food handler education or
 training program:
 (i)  accredited under Subchapter D, Chapter
 438; or
 (ii)  accredited by the American National
 Standards Institute; and
 (B)  the farmers' market that hosts the
 demonstration complies with Sections 437.020 and 437.0202, the
 requirements of a temporary food establishment under this chapter,
 and rules adopted under this chapter; and
 (2)  when the demonstrator provides a sample of food to
 consumers:
 (A)  the demonstrator provides a sample only and
 not a full serving; and
 (B)  samples of food prepared during a
 demonstration are disposed of not later than two hours after the
 beginning of the demonstration.
 SECTION 4.  Section 438.046, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (b) and (c) and adding Subsections
 (b-1), (b-2), and (d) to read as follows:
 (b)  A local health jurisdiction that requires training for a
 food service worker shall accept as sufficient to meet the
 jurisdiction's training and testing requirements a training course
 that is:
 (1)  accredited by the department and listed with the
 registry; or
 (2)  accredited by the American National Standards
 Institute.
 (b-1)  A food service worker trained in a course for the
 employees of a single entity is considered to have met a local
 health jurisdiction's training and testing requirements only as to
 food service performed for that entity.
 (b-2)  A food service worker trained in a course offered or
 permitted by a local health jurisdiction is considered to have met a
 local health jurisdiction's training and testing requirements as to
 food service performed in that jurisdiction only.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (d), any [Any] fee
 charged by a local health jurisdiction for a certificate issued to a
 food service worker trained by an accredited course listed in the
 registry may not exceed the lesser of:
 (1)  the reasonable cost incurred by the jurisdiction
 in issuing the certificate; or
 (2)  the fee charged by the jurisdiction to issue a
 certificate to a food service worker certified by the jurisdiction
 as having met the training and testing requirements by any other
 means.
 (d)  A local health jurisdiction may not charge a fee for a
 certificate issued to a food handler trained by an accredited
 course described by Subsection (b).
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *