Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB582 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 582


 AN ACT
 relating to training courses for certain food handlers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 438.046, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  A food service worker trained in a food handler
 training course accredited by the American National Standards
 Institute is considered to have met a local health jurisdiction's
 training, testing, and permitting requirements.  A local health
 jurisdiction may require a food establishment, as that term is
 defined by Section 438.101, to maintain on the premises of the food
 establishment a certificate of completion of the training course
 for employees of the food establishment.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 582 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 26, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 582 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 138,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor