Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB585 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson, Burton S.B. No. 585
 (In the Senate - Filed February 16, 2015; February 23, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 29, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 29, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the content of detailed reports filed by registered
 lobbyists.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 305.0061(a), (b), and (c), Government
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  If a registrant or a person on the registrant's behalf
 and with the registrant's consent or ratification makes
 expenditures that exceed $50 [60 percent of the amount of the
 legislative per diem in] a day for transportation or lodging for a
 member of the legislative or executive branch or for the immediate
 family of a member of the legislative or executive branch, the
 registrant shall also state the following on the report filed under
 Section 305.006:
 (1)  the name of the member of the legislative or
 executive branch in whose behalf the expenditure is made;
 (2)  the place and date of the transportation or
 lodging; and
 (3)  the purpose of the transportation or lodging.
 (b)  If a registrant or a person on the registrant's behalf
 and with the registrant's consent or ratification makes
 expenditures that exceed $50 [60 percent of the amount of the
 legislative per diem in] a day for food and beverages for a member
 of the legislative or executive branch or for the immediate family
 of a member of the legislative or executive branch or makes
 expenditures that exceed $50 [60 percent of the amount of the
 legislative per diem in] a day for entertainment for a member of the
 legislative or executive branch or for the immediate family of a
 member of the legislative or executive branch, the registrant shall
 also state the following on the report filed under Section 305.006:
 (1)  the name of the member of the legislative or
 executive branch in whose behalf the expenditure is made;
 (2)  the place and date of the expenditure; and
 (3)  the amount of the expenditure by the appropriate
 category of the amount, as determined by the commission.
 (c)  If a registrant or a person on the registrant's behalf
 and with the registrant's consent or ratification gives to a member
 of the legislative or executive branch, or to the immediate family
 of a member of the legislative or executive branch, a gift or an
 award or memento, the value of which exceeds $50 per gift, award, or
 memento, the registrant shall also state the following on the
 report filed under Section 305.006:
 (1)  the name of the member of the legislative or
 executive branch in whose behalf the expenditure is made;
 (2)  a general description of the gift, award, or
 memento; and
 (3)  the amount of the expenditure by the appropriate
 category of the amount, as determined by the commission.
 SECTION 2.  Section 305.0061(g), Government Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a gift, award, or memento given to or expenditures for
 transportation, lodging, food, beverages, or entertainment made
 for a member of the legislative or executive branch or the immediate
 family of a member of the legislative or executive branch on or
 after the effective date of this Act.  A gift, award, or memento
 given to or an expenditure for transportation, lodging, food,
 beverages, or entertainment made for a member of the legislative or
 executive branch or the immediate family of a member of the
 legislative or executive branch before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the gift, award, or
 memento was given, or the date the expenditure for transportation,
 lodging, food, beverages, or entertainment was made, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *