Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB59 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 59


 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption from competitive bidding requirements for
 the procurement of services for victims of family violence.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 51.004, Human Resources
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.004.  CONTRACT ELIGIBILITY; PROCUREMENT;
 APPLICATION PROCESS [BIDS].
 SECTION 2.  Section 51.004, Human Resources Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (e), as amended by S.B. 219, Acts of the 84th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, and by adding Subsections (f)
 and (g) to read as follows:
 (e)  The commission shall use a noncompetitive procurement
 procedure to award a contract under Section 51.003(a) or (b) if the
 commission determines that there is no competition between eligible
 family violence centers for services or a service area.  If the
 commission determines that there is competition between eligible
 family violence centers for services or a service area, the
 commission shall award a contract under Section 51.003(a) or (b)
 through an application process that considers the eligibility
 requirements and other factors provided in this section and
 allocates the money in accordance with this chapter and with
 consideration of the family violence services plan under Section
 51.0021 [a competitive procurement procedure].
 (f)  The commission shall consult with a statewide family
 violence organization to develop the application process described
 in Subsection (e) but may not involve the organization in the
 contract selection or award process.
 (g)  To the extent of any conflict between this section and
 any other law, including Chapter 2155, Government Code, this
 section controls.
 SECTION 3.  Section 51.003(d), Human Resources Code, as
 amended by S.B. 219, Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular Session,
 2015, is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a contract awarded on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 59 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 59 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 139,
 Nays 1, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor