Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB593 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 593
 (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2015; February 23, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 April 27, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0, 1 present not
 voting; April 27, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 593 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to pretrial settlement discussions during a judicial
 appeal of certain ad valorem tax determinations and the effect of
 certain pretrial settlement offers on the calculation of an award
 of attorney's fees in such an appeal.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 42, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Section 42.227 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.227.  PRETRIAL SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS.  (a)  On
 motion by a party to an appeal under this chapter for which a
 discovery request to designate one or more expert witnesses is
 made, the court shall enter an order requiring the parties to engage
 in settlement discussions before the trial begins.  The motion must
 be made not later than the 210th day before the date the discovery
 period in the appeal ends.
 (b)  If a motion is made under this section, the court shall
 order the settlement discussions to be conducted not later than the
 90th day after the date the motion is made.  The court may provide in
 the order that settlement discussions be conducted in a specific
 manner, including as part of an informal settlement conference or
 another form of alternative dispute resolution.
 (c)  Each party ordered to engage in settlement discussions
 must make a good faith effort to resolve the matter under appeal
 during the discussions.
 SECTION 2.  Section 42.29, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  This subsection applies only if the appraisal district
 or the chief appraiser made a written settlement offer to the
 property owner on or before the 45th day before the date the trial
 began and a record of the offer was submitted to the court.  For the
 purposes of Subsections (a)(2) and (b)(2), the amount by which the
 property owner's tax liability is reduced as a result of the appeal
 is computed by subtracting the property owner's tax liability
 resulting from the court's final determination of the appeal from
 the property owner's tax liability that would have resulted had the
 property owner accepted the most recent settlement offer meeting
 the requirements of this subsection.  This subsection may not be
 construed to preclude a provision that waives attorney's fees or a
 refund of interest from being included in a settlement offer.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 42.29, Tax Code, applies only to an appeal filed under Chapter 42,
 Tax Code, on or after the effective date of this Act. An appeal
 filed under Chapter 42, Tax Code, before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law in effect when the appeal was filed, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *