Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB596 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/25/2015

                    By: Estes S.B. No. 596
 (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2015; February 23, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 March 25, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 25, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the imposition of the student centers fee at Texas
 Woman's University.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 54.525, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The board of regents of Texas Woman's University may
 levy a regular, fixed student fee of not less than $25 or more than
 $75 [$40] per student for each semester of the long session and of
 not less than $12.50 or more than $35 [$20] per student for each
 term of the summer session, as the board determines is just and
 necessary for the purpose of financing, improving, operating,
 maintaining, and equipping student centers and acquiring or
 constructing additions to student centers.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the board may increase
 the amount of the fee for a semester or summer session to an amount
 that does not exceed $150 if the increase is approved by a majority
 vote of those students participating in a general election called
 for that purpose.  The increased amount under this subsection may
 not be charged after the fifth academic year in which the increased
 amount is first charged unless, before the end of that academic
 year, the institution has issued bonds payable from the fee, in
 which event the increased amount may not be charged after the
 academic year in which all such bonds, including refunding bonds
 for those bonds, have been fully paid.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to fees imposed for a semester or term that begins on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *