Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB62 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Huffines S.B. No. 62
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2014; January 26, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 April 29, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 5; April 29, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 62 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to accounting for costs incurred by this state as a result
 of the presence of persons who are not lawfully present in the
 United States.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 403, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 403.0112 to read as follows:
 Sec. 403.0112.  ACCOUNTING FOR COSTS OF ILLEGAL IMMIGRATION.
 (a)  Not later than the 30th day before the first day of each
 regular legislative session, the comptroller shall issue to the
 speaker of the house of representatives, the lieutenant governor,
 the governor, and the attorney general an estimation of the
 financial costs to this state incurred during the preceding
 two-year period that resulted from the presence in this state of
 persons who are not lawfully present in the United States.
 (b)  The estimation must include a separate accounting for
 the estimated costs to the state incurred in specific categories of
 state spending as determined by the comptroller.  The categories
 must include costs of education of, health care for, and
 incarceration of persons described by Subsection (a) and costs of
 border security and law enforcement attributable to those persons.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *