Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB662 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 662
 (In the Senate - Filed February 20, 2015; February 24, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 20, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 662 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the representation of certain indigent applicants for a
 writ of habeas corpus.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 11, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 11.074 to read as follows:
 Art. 11.074.  COURT-APPOINTED REPRESENTATION REQUIRED IN
 CERTAIN CASES. (a)  This article applies only to a felony or
 misdemeanor case in which the applicant seeks relief on a writ of
 habeas corpus from a judgment of conviction that:
 (1)  imposes a penalty other than death; or
 (2)  orders community supervision.
 (b)  If at any time the state represents to the convicting
 court that an eligible indigent defendant under Article 1.051 who
 was sentenced or had a sentence suspended is not guilty, is guilty
 of only a lesser offense, or was convicted or sentenced under a law
 that has been found unconstitutional by the court of criminal
 appeals or the United States Supreme Court, the court shall appoint
 an attorney to represent the indigent defendant for purposes of
 filing an application for a writ of habeas corpus, if an application
 has not been filed, or to otherwise represent the indigent
 defendant in a proceeding based on the application for the writ.
 (c)  An attorney appointed under this article shall be
 compensated as provided by Article 26.05.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act relating to
 the application of writ of habeas corpus apply regardless of
 whether the offense for which the applicant is in custody was
 committed before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *