Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB664 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Taylor of Collin S.B. No. 664
 (In the Senate - Filed February 20, 2015; February 24, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and
 Economic Development; March 11, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; March 11, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to employment termination for falsification of military
 record in obtaining employment or employment benefits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act shall be known as the Stolen Valor Act.
 SECTION 2.  Title 3, Labor Code, is amended by adding Chapter
 105 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 105.  EMPLOYMENT TERMINATION FOR FALSIFICATION OF MILITARY
 RECORD IN OBTAINING EMPLOYMENT OR EMPLOYMENT BENEFITS
 Sec. 105.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Employee" means an individual who is employed by
 an employer for compensation.
 (2)  "Employer" means a person who employs one or more
 employees.
 (3)  "Military record" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 32.54, Penal Code.
 Sec. 105.002.  EMPLOYMENT TERMINATION; EMPLOYMENT CONTRACT
 VOID AND UNENFORCEABLE.  (a)  An employer may discharge an
 employee, regardless of whether the employee is employed under an
 employment contract with the employer, if the employer determines,
 based on a reasonable belief, that the employee, in obtaining the
 employee's employment or any benefit relating to the employee's
 employment, falsified or otherwise misrepresented any information
 regarding the employee's military record in a manner that would
 constitute an offense under Section 32.54, Penal Code.
 (b)  An employment contract entered into by an employer with
 an employee discharged by the employer under this section is void
 and unenforceable as against public policy.
 Sec. 105.003.  SUIT TO APPEAL TERMINATION. An employee who
 was employed by an employer under an employment contract on the date
 of the employee's termination and who believes the employee was
 wrongfully terminated under Section 105.002 may bring suit against
 the employer in a district court in the county in which the
 termination occurred for appropriate relief, including rehiring or
 reinstatement to the employee's previous job, payment of back
 wages, and reestablishment of employee benefits to which the
 employee otherwise would have been eligible if the employee had not
 been terminated.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 105, Labor Code, as added by this Act,
 applies only to an employee termination that occurs on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *