Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB671 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/16/2015

                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 671
 (In the Senate - Filed February 20, 2015; February 24, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 16, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 16, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 671 By:  Huffines


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of Loop 567 in Granbury as the Deputy
 Sergeant Lance McLean Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.109 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.109.  DEPUTY SERGEANT LANCE MCLEAN MEMORIAL
 HIGHWAY.  (a)  The portion of Loop 567 in Granbury between its
 intersection with U.S. Highway 377 and its intersection with
 Business Highway 377 is designated as the Deputy Sergeant Lance
 McLean Memorial Highway.  The designation is in addition to any
 other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Deputy Sergeant Lance McLean Memorial Highway
 and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *