Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB684 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 684


 AN ACT
 relating to the relationship of certain optometrists, therapeutic
 optometrists, and ophthalmologists with certain managed care
 plans, including preferred provider plans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1301.051(e), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (e)  An insurer may not withhold a designation to:
 (1)  a podiatrist described by Section 1301.0521; or
 (2)  an optometrist, therapeutic optometrist, or
 ophthalmologist described by Section 1301.0522.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 1301, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1301.0522 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1301.0522.  DESIGNATION OF CERTAIN OPTOMETRISTS,
 THERAPEUTIC OPTOMETRISTS, AND OPHTHALMOLOGISTS AS PREFERRED
 PROVIDERS. (a)  Notwithstanding Section 1301.051, an insurer may
 not withhold the designation of preferred provider to an
 optometrist or therapeutic optometrist licensed by the Texas
 Optometry Board or an ophthalmologist licensed by the Texas Medical
 Board who:
 (1)  joins the professional practice of a contracted
 preferred provider;
 (2)  applies to the insurer for designation as a
 preferred provider; and
 (3)  complies with the terms and conditions of
 eligibility to be a preferred provider.
 (b)  An optometrist, therapeutic optometrist, or
 ophthalmologist designated as a preferred provider under this
 section must comply with the terms of the preferred provider
 contract used by the insurer or the insurer's network provider.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter D, Chapter 1451, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1451.156 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1451.156.  PROHIBITED CONDUCT.  (a)  A managed care
 plan, as described by Section 1451.152(a), may not directly or
 indirectly:
 (1)  control or attempt to control the professional
 judgment, manner of practice, or practice of an optometrist or
 therapeutic optometrist;
 (2)  employ an optometrist or therapeutic optometrist
 to provide a vision care product or service as defined by Section
 1451.155;
 (3)  pay an optometrist or therapeutic optometrist for
 a service not provided;
 (4)  restrict or limit an optometrist's or therapeutic
 optometrist's choice of sources or suppliers of services or
 materials, including optical laboratories used by the optometrist
 or therapeutic optometrist to provide services or materials to a
 patient; or
 (5)  require an optometrist or therapeutic optometrist
 to disclose a patient's confidential or protected health
 information unless the disclosure is authorized by the patient or
 permitted without authorization under the Health Insurance
 Portability and Accountability Act of 1996 (42 U.S.C. Section 1320d
 et seq.) or under Section 602.053.
 (b)  Subsection (a)(2) does not prohibit a managed care plan
 from employing an optometrist or therapeutic optometrist for
 utilization review or for operations of the managed care plan.
 (c)  Subsection (a)(3) does not prohibit the use of
 capitation as a method of payment.
 (d)  Subsection (a)(4) does not restrict or limit a managed
 care plan's determination of specific amounts of coverage or
 reimbursement for the use of network or out-of-network suppliers or
 laboratories.
 (e)  An optometrist or therapeutic optometrist must disclose
 to a patient any business interest the optometrist or therapeutic
 optometrist has in an out-of-network supplier or manufacturer to
 which the optometrist or therapeutic optometrist refers the
 patient.
 (f)  This section shall be liberally construed to prevent
 managed care plans from controlling or attempting to control the
 professional judgment, manner of practice, or practice of an
 optometrist or therapeutic optometrist.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  Section 1301.0522, Insurance Code, as added
 by this Act, applies only to a contract between a preferred provider
 and an insurer that is entered into or renewed on or after September
 1, 2015.  A contract between a preferred provider and an insurer
 that is entered into or renewed before September 1, 2015, is
 governed by the law as it existed immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 (b)  Section 1451.156, Insurance Code, as added by this Act,
 applies only to a contract between a managed care plan issuer and an
 optometrist or therapeutic optometrist entered into or renewed, or
 a managed care plan delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed, on
 or after September 1, 2015.  A contract entered into or renewed, or
 a plan delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed, before September
 1, 2015, is governed by the law as it existed immediately before
 that date, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 684 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2015, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 22, 2015, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 29, 2015, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 684 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 13, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 141,
 Nays 0, two present not voting; May 22, 2015, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 27, 2015, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 139, Nays 1, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor