Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB695 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/18/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 695


 AN ACT
 relating to a study of the feasibility and desirability of creating
 and maintaining a coastal barrier system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  The legislature shall establish a joint
 interim committee to continue to study the feasibility and
 desirability of creating and maintaining a coastal barrier system
 in this state that includes a series of gates and barriers to
 prevent storm surge damage to gulf beaches or coastal ports,
 industry, or property.
 (b)  The committee is composed of:
 (1)  the members of the standing committee of the
 senate that has primary jurisdiction over natural resources;
 (2)  the members of the standing committee of the house
 of representatives that has primary jurisdiction over land and
 resource management;
 (3)  two members of the senate appointed by the
 lieutenant governor, each of whom represents a district in a county
 that borders the Gulf of Mexico; and
 (4)  two members of the house of representatives
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives, each of
 whom represents a district in a county that borders the Gulf of
 Mexico.
 (c)  The lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of
 representatives shall jointly designate a chair or, alternatively,
 designate two co-chairs from among the committee membership.
 (d)  The committee may adopt rules necessary to carry out the
 committee's duties under this section.
 (e)  Not later than December 1, 2016, the committee shall
 report to the governor and the legislature the findings of the study
 and any recommendations developed by the committee under this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 695 passed the Senate on
 March 23, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 695 passed the House on
 May 15, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 129, Nays 10, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor