Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB724 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Perry S.B. No. 724
 (In the Senate - Filed February 24, 2015; March 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 April 23, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 12, Nays 0; April 23, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 724 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the motor vehicle sales tax applicable to motor
 vehicles used by transportation companies for certain purposes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 152.082, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 152.082.  SALE OF MOTOR VEHICLE TO OR USE OF MOTOR
 VEHICLE BY PUBLIC AGENCY.  The taxes imposed by this chapter do not
 apply to the sale [of a motor vehicle to] or use of a motor vehicle
 [by a public agency] if the motor vehicle is operated with an exempt
 license plate issued under Section 502.451, Transportation Code,
 and is for use by:
 (1)  a public agency; or
 (2)  a commercial transportation company to provide
 transportation services under a contract with:
 (A)  a board of county school trustees or school
 district board of trustees under Section 34.008, Education Code; or
 (B)  the governing body of an open-enrollment
 charter school.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *