Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB734 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Fraser S.B. No. 734
 (In the Senate - Filed February 24, 2015; March 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and
 Economic Development; March 18, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the setting of annual interest rates for utility
 deposits by the Public Utility Commission of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 183.003, Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 183.003.  RATE OF INTEREST. The commission on or before
 each December 1[, or the next regular workday if December 1 is a
 Saturday, Sunday, or legal holiday,] shall set the annual interest
 rate for the next calendar year on deposits governed by this chapter
 at the average rate paid over the previous 12-month period on United
 States treasury bills with a 26-week maturity.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *