Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB740 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 740


 AN ACT
 relating to the assessment of court costs and fees on conviction of
 multiple offenses or on conviction of multiple counts of the same
 offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 102, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended by adding Article 102.073 to read as follows:
 Art. 102.073.  ASSESSMENT OF COURT COSTS AND FEES IN A SINGLE
 CRIMINAL ACTION. (a)  In a single criminal action in which a
 defendant is convicted of two or more offenses or of multiple counts
 of the same offense, the court may assess each court cost or fee
 only once against the defendant.
 (b)  In a criminal action described by Subsection (a), each
 court cost or fee the amount of which is determined according to the
 category of offense must be assessed using the highest category of
 offense that is possible based on the defendant's convictions.
 (c)  This article does not apply to a single criminal action
 alleging only the commission of two or more offenses punishable by
 fine only.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 court cost or fee imposed on or after the effective date of this
 Act, regardless of whether the offense for which the cost or fee was
 imposed was committed before, on, or after that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 740 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 740 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 128,
 Nays 16, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor