Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB785 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/09/2015

                    By: Uresti S.B. No. 785
 (In the Senate - Filed February 25, 2015; March 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; April 9, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 9, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 785 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requirements for assisted living facility license
 applicants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 247.022, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (d), (e), and (f) to read as follows:
 (d)  An assisted living facility license applicant in good
 standing may request an initial license that does not require an
 on-site health inspection.  The department may not require the
 applicant to admit a resident to the facility before the department
 issues the license.  The department shall require the license
 applicant to submit for approval policies and procedures,
 verification of employee background checks, and employee
 credentials.
 (e)  The department shall conduct a survey of a facility
 issued an initial license under Subsection (d) not later than the
 90th day after the date on which the department issues the license
 to the facility.  Until the department conducts the survey, the
 facility shall disclose to all residents and prospective residents
 that the department has not yet conducted the survey required by
 this subsection.
 (f)  For purposes of this section, a license applicant is in
 "good standing" if:
 (1)  the license applicant, or the controlling person
 of the license applicant if the license applicant is a newly formed
 business entity, has operated or been the controlling person of an
 assisted living facility in this state for six consecutive years;
 and
 (2)  each assisted living facility operated by the
 license applicant, or operated or controlled by a controlling
 person of the license applicant if the license applicant is a newly
 formed business entity:
 (A)  has not had a violation that resulted in
 actual harm to a resident or that posed an immediate threat of harm
 causing, or likely to cause, serious injury, impairment, or death
 of a resident; and
 (B)  in the six years preceding the date on which
 the license applicant submits the application, has not had a
 sanction imposed by the department against the facility, including:
 (i)  the imposition of a civil or
 administrative penalty or an injunction;
 (ii)  the denial, suspension, or revocation
 of a license; or
 (iii)  an emergency closure.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt the rules necessary to implement
 the change in law made by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *