Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB789 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 789


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain municipalities to provide
 sewer service to areas within the municipal boundaries without
 obtaining a certificate of public convenience and necessity.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 13.247(a), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  If an area is within the boundaries of a municipality,
 all retail public utilities certified or entitled to certification
 under this chapter to provide service or operate facilities in that
 area may continue and extend service in its area of public
 convenience and necessity within the area pursuant to the rights
 granted by its certificate and this chapter, unless the
 municipality exercises its power of eminent domain to acquire the
 property of the retail public utility under Subsection (d).  Except
 as provided by Section 13.2475 or 13.255, a municipally owned or
 operated utility may not provide retail water and sewer utility
 service within the area certificated to another retail public
 utility without first having obtained from the utility commission a
 certificate of public convenience and necessity that includes the
 areas to be served.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter G, Chapter 13, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 13.2475 to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.2475.  CERTIFICATES OF PUBLIC CONVENIENCE AND
 NECESSITY TO PROVIDE SEWER SERVICE IN CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES.
 (a)  This section applies only to a municipality:
 (1)  with a population of more than 95,000;
 (2)  located in a county that:
 (A)  borders Lake Palestine; and
 (B)  has a population of more than 200,000;
 (3)  that owns and operates a utility that provides
 sewer service; and
 (4)  that has an area within the boundaries of the
 municipality that is certificated to another retail public utility
 that provides sewer service.
 (b)  A municipality may provide sewer service to an area
 entirely within the municipality's boundaries without first having
 to obtain from the utility commission a certificate of public
 convenience and necessity that includes the area to be served,
 regardless of whether the area to be served is certificated to
 another retail public utility.
 (c)  Not less than 30 days before the municipality begins
 providing sewer service to an area certificated to another retail
 public utility, the municipality shall provide notice to the retail
 public utility and the utility commission of its intention to
 provide service to the area.
 (d)  On receipt of the notice required by Subsection (c), a
 retail public utility may:
 (1)  petition the utility commission to decertify its
 certificate for the area to be served by the municipality; or
 (2)  discontinue service to the area to be served by the
 municipality, provided that there is no interruption of service to
 any customer.
 (e)  This section may not be construed to limit the right of a
 retail public utility to provide service in an area certificated to
 the retail public utility.
 (f)  This section does not expand a municipality's power of
 eminent domain under Chapter 21, Property Code.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Public Utility Commission of Texas shall adopt
 rules and establish procedures relating to the notice required
 under Section 13.2475, Water Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 789 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 26, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 789 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 21, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 133,
 Nays 10, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor