Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB797 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 797
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2015; March 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water,
 and Rural Affairs; April 14, 2015, rereferred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; April 29, 2015, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 29, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 797 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a grant program to reduce wait times for agricultural
 inspections of vehicles at ports of entry along the Texas-Mexico
 border.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 12, Agriculture Code, is amended by
 adding Section 12.050 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.050.  TRADE AGRICULTURAL INSPECTION GRANT PROGRAM.
 (a)  Using money appropriated for this purpose or money received
 under Subsection (g), the department may make a grant to a nonprofit
 organization for the purpose of promoting the agricultural
 processing industry in this state by reducing wait times for
 agricultural inspections of vehicles at ports of entry along the
 border with the United Mexican States.
 (b)  The department shall request proposals for the award of
 a grant under this section.  The department shall evaluate the
 proposals and award a grant based on the proposed program's
 quantifiable effectiveness and the potentially positive impact on
 the agricultural processing industry in this state.
 (c)  A grant awarded under this section must be made to an
 organization that has demonstrated experience working with border
 inspection authorities to reduce border crossing wait times.
 (d)  A grant recipient may use grant money received under
 this section only to pay for activities directly related to the
 purpose of the grant program as described by Subsection (a).  A
 grant recipient may use grant money to reimburse a federal
 governmental agency that, at the request of the grant recipient,
 provides additional border agricultural inspectors or pays
 overtime to border agricultural inspectors at ports of entry along
 the border with the United Mexican States.
 (e)  The department shall establish procedures to administer
 the grant program, including a procedure for the submission of a
 proposal and a procedure to be used by the department to evaluate a
 proposal.
 (f)  The department shall enter into a contract that includes
 performance requirements with each grant recipient.  The department
 shall monitor and enforce the terms of the contract.  The contract
 must authorize the department to recoup grant money from a grant
 recipient for failure of the grant recipient to comply with the
 terms of the contract.
 (g)  The department may solicit and accept gifts, grants, and
 donations from any source for the purpose of awarding grants under
 this section.
 (h)  To be eligible to receive a grant under this section, a
 nonprofit organization must provide matching funds.  The amount of
 the grant may not exceed the amount of matching funds.  The
 department may not require a nonprofit organization to provide
 matching funds in an amount that exceeds the amount of the grant.
 (i)  The department may adopt any rules necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *