Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB804 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/04/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 804


 AN ACT
 relating to the period of eligibility for support from the
 universal service plan for certain providers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 56.023(p), Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (p)  If an incumbent local exchange company or cooperative is
 ineligible for support under a plan established under Section
 56.021(1) for services in an exchange, a plan established under
 Section 56.021(1) may not provide support to any other
 telecommunications providers for services in that exchange, except
 that an eligible telecommunications provider that is receiving
 support under Section 56.021(1)(A) in that exchange shall continue
 to receive such support until the later of December 31, 2017, or the
 second anniversary of [for a 24-month period following] the date
 the incumbent local exchange provider or cooperative ceases
 receiving support in that exchange.  The support received by the
 eligible telecommunications provider during that [the 24-month]
 period shall be at the same monthly per line support level in effect
 for that exchange as of the date the incumbent local exchange
 provider or cooperative ceases receiving funding in that exchange.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 804 passed the Senate on
 April 1, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 28, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 804 passed the House on
 May 1, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 99, Nays 35, two present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor