Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB807 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/23/2015

                    By: Campbell, Lucio S.B. No. 807
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2015; March 3, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and
 Military Installations; March 23, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 23, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 807 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to occupational license application and examination fees
 for certain military service members, military veterans, and
 military spouses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 55, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Section 55.009 to read as follows:
 Sec. 55.009.  LICENSE APPLICATION AND EXAMINATION FEES.
 Notwithstanding any other law, a state agency that issues a license
 shall waive the license application and examination fees paid to
 the state for an applicant who is:
 (1)  a military service member or military veteran
 whose military service, training, or education substantially meets
 all of the requirements for the license; or
 (2)  a military service member, military veteran, or
 military spouse who holds a current license issued by another
 jurisdiction that has licensing requirements that are
 substantially equivalent to the requirements for the license in
 this state.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an application for an occupational license filed on or after the
 effective date of this Act.  An application for a license filed
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect immediately before that date, and that law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *