Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB822 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 822
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2015; March 3, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 18, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 18, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 822 By:  Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of certain definitions and certain
 laws governing attorneys ad litem, guardians ad litem, and amicus
 attorneys in family law proceedings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 2, Family Code, is amended by adding
 Subtitle E to read as follows:
 SUBTITLE E. GENERAL PROVISIONS
 CHAPTER 47. GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 47.001.  APPLICABILITY OF DEFINITIONS. (a)  Except as
 provided by Subsection (b), the definitions in Chapter 101 apply to
 terms used in this title.
 (b)  If a term defined in this title has a meaning different
 from the meaning provided by Chapter 101, the meaning provided by
 this title prevails.
 Sec. 47.002.  APPLICABILITY OF LAWS RELATING TO ATTORNEYS AD
 LITEM, GUARDIANS AD LITEM, AND AMICUS ATTORNEYS. Chapter 107
 applies to the appointment of an attorney ad litem, guardian ad
 litem, or amicus attorney under this title.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a proceeding that is commenced on or after the effective date of
 this Act.  A proceeding that is commenced before that date is
 governed by the law as it existed on the date the proceeding was
 commenced, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *