Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB828 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Taylor of Galveston S.B. No. 828
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2015; March 3, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 20, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 828 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sale of distilled spirits to ultimate consumers by
 the holder of a distiller's and rectifier's permit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 14.05(c), Alcoholic Beverage Code, as
 added by Chapter 106 (S.B. 905), Acts of the 83rd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2013, is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The holder of a distiller's and rectifier's permit may
 not under Subsection (b) sell more than two 750 milliliter bottles
 or the equivalent of each distilled spirits product that has a label
 that complies with the approval issued by the United States Alcohol
 and Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau [or the equivalent] to the same
 consumer within a 30-day period.  The total sales made by the holder
 of a distiller's and rectifier's permit under Subsection (b) to the
 same consumer may not exceed six 750 milliliter bottles or the
 equivalent within a 30-day period.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *