Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB836 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 836
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2015; March 4, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; April 20, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 836 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to management services for the physical facilities of the
 Texas School for the Blind and Visually Impaired and the Texas
 School for the Deaf.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 30.022(h-1), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (h-1)  The Texas Facilities Commission shall provide all
 facilities maintenance services for the physical facilities of the
 school[, including facilities construction, cabling, facility
 reconfiguration, and any other services] as provided by Section
 2165.007, Government Code [a memorandum of understanding between
 the board and the Texas Facilities Commission].
 SECTION 2.  Section 30.052(h-1), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (h-1)  The Texas Facilities Commission shall provide all
 facilities maintenance services for the physical facilities of the
 school[, including facilities construction, cabling, facility
 reconfiguration, and any other services] as provided by Section
 2165.007, Government Code [a memorandum of understanding between
 the board and the Texas Facilities Commission].
 SECTION 3.  Section 2165.007(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, the commission shall
 provide facilities management services in relation to all state
 agency facilities in Travis County or a county adjacent to Travis
 County.  The commission's duty does not apply to:
 (1)  a facility owned or operated by an institution of
 higher education;
 (2)  military facilities;
 (3)  facilities owned or operated by the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice;
 (4)  facilities owned or operated by the Texas Juvenile
 Justice Department;
 (5)  facilities owned or operated by the Texas
 Department of Transportation;
 (6)  the Capitol, including the Capitol Extension, the
 General Land Office building, the Bob Bullock Texas State History
 Museum, any museum located on the Capitol grounds, the Governor's
 Mansion, and any property maintained by the Texas Historical
 Commission under Sections 442.0072 and 442.0073;
 (7)  a facility determined by the commission to be
 completely residential;
 (8)  a regional or field office of a state agency;
 (9)  a facility located within or on state park
 property;
 (10)  the property known as the Finance Commission
 Building described by deed recorded in Volume 5080, Page 1099, of
 the Deed Records of Travis County, Texas; or
 (11)  the property known as the Credit Union Department
 Building described by deed recorded in Volume 6126, Page 27, of the
 Deed Records of Travis County, Texas[;
 [(12)     facilities owned or operated by the Texas School
 for the Blind and Visually Impaired; or
 [(13)     facilities owned or operated by the Texas School
 for the Deaf].
 SECTION 4.  (a)  Not later than September 1, 2015, the
 following are transferred from the Texas School for the Blind and
 Visually Impaired to the Texas Facilities Commission:
 (1)  all remaining powers, duties, functions,
 programs, and activities of the Texas School for the Blind and
 Visually Impaired relating to the maintenance of the school's
 physical facilities;
 (2)  any obligations and contracts of the Texas School
 for the Blind and Visually Impaired that are directly related to
 implementing a power, duty, function, program, or activity
 transferred under this subsection; and
 (3)  all property and records in the custody of the
 Texas School for the Blind and Visually Impaired that are related to
 a power, duty, function, program, or activity transferred under
 this subsection and all funds appropriated by the legislature for
 that power, duty, function, program, or activity.
 (b)  The Texas Facilities Commission and the Texas School for
 the Blind and Visually Impaired shall enter into a memorandum of
 understanding that establishes a plan for the identification and
 transfer of the records, personnel, property, and unspent
 appropriations of the Texas School for the Blind and Visually
 Impaired that are used for purposes of the commission's powers and
 duties directly related to the maintenance of the school's physical
 facilities under Section 30.022, Education Code.
 SECTION 5.  (a)  Not later than September 1, 2015, the
 following are transferred from the Texas School for the Deaf to the
 Texas Facilities Commission:
 (1)  all remaining powers, duties, functions,
 programs, and activities of the Texas School for the Deaf relating
 to the maintenance of the school's physical facilities;
 (2)  any obligations and contracts of the Texas School
 for the Deaf that are directly related to implementing a power,
 duty, function, program, or activity transferred under this
 subsection; and
 (3)  all property and records in the custody of the
 Texas School for the Deaf that are related to a power, duty,
 function, program, or activity transferred under this subsection
 and all funds appropriated by the legislature for that power, duty,
 function, program, or activity.
 (b)  The Texas Facilities Commission and the Texas School for
 the Deaf shall enter into a memorandum of understanding that
 establishes a plan for the identification and transfer of the
 records, personnel, property, and unspent appropriations of the
 Texas School for the Deaf that are used for purposes of the
 commission's powers and duties directly related to the maintenance
 of the school's physical facilities under Section 30.052, Education
 Code.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *