Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB837 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/23/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 837


 AN ACT
 relating to a common characteristic or use project in a public
 improvement district in certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 372.0035(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to:
 (1)  a municipality that:
 (A)  has a population of more than 650,000 and
 less [one million and a council-manager form of government and that
 is located wholly or partly in a county with a population of more]
 than two million; or
 (B)  has a population of more than 325,000 and
 less than 625,000; and
 (2)  a public improvement district established under
 this subchapter and solely composed of territory in which the only
 businesses are:
 (A)  hotels with 100 or more rooms ordinarily used
 for sleeping, if the district is established by a municipality
 described by Subdivision (1)(A); or
 (B)  hotels with 75 or more rooms ordinarily used
 for sleeping, if the district is established by a municipality
 described by Subdivision (1)(B).
 SECTION 2.  Section 372.005, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), a petition for the
 establishment of a public improvement district described by Section
 372.0035(a)(2) is sufficient only if signed by record owners of
 taxable real property liable for assessment under the proposal who
 constitute:
 (1)  more than 60 percent of the appraised value of
 taxable real property liable for assessment under the proposal, as
 determined by the current roll of the appraisal district in which
 the property is located; and
 (2)  more than 60 percent of:
 (A)  all record owners of taxable real property
 that are liable for assessment under the proposal; or
 (B)  the area of all taxable real property that is
 liable for assessment under the proposal.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 837 passed the Senate on
 May 6, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 19, Nays 12; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 22, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 17, Nays 14.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 837 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 18, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 94,
 Nays 43, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor