Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB850 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/23/2015

                    By: Taylor of Collin, Lucio S.B. No. 850
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2015; March 4, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and
 Military Installations; March 23, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 2; March 23, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a public duty justification for conduct of a service
 member of the Texas military forces.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 437, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 437.2235 to read as follows:
 Sec. 437.2235.  PUBLIC DUTY JUSTIFICATION. Section 9.21,
 Penal Code, applies to conduct of a service member of the Texas
 military forces ordered into service of this state by proper
 authority that is performed in the service member's official
 capacity.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *