Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB853 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2015

                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 853
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2015; March 4, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 8, 2015,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 13, Nays 0;
 April 8, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the signature requirement for a sales tax permit
 application filed electronically.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 151.202, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  An application that is filed electronically complies
 with the signature requirement under Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *