Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB858 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Eltife S.B. No. 858
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2015; March 4, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 March 30, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; March 30, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to license holders authorized to obtain label approval for
 beer, ale, and malt liquor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 101.67(b), Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Only a brewer's or nonresident brewer's permittee, [or]
 a manufacturer's or nonresident manufacturer's licensee, or a
 brewpub licensee may apply for and receive label approval on beer,
 ale, or malt liquor.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *