Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB862 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2015

                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 862
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2015; March 4, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 20, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 862 By:  Taylor of Galveston


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to voting methods in a property owners' association
 election or vote.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 209.00592, Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Unless a dedicatory instrument provides otherwise, a
 property owners' association is not required to provide an owner
 with more than one voting method so long as an owner may vote by
 absentee ballot or proxy.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *