Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB864 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 864
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2015; March 4, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 20, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 864 By:  Eltife


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to secret ballots in a property owners' association
 election or vote.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 209.0058, Property Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (d), any [Any] vote
 cast in an election or vote by a member of a property owners'
 association must be in writing and signed by the member.
 (d)  A property owners' association may adopt rules to allow
 voting by secret ballot by members of the association.  The
 association must take measures to reasonably ensure that:
 (1)  a member cannot cast more votes than the member is
 eligible to cast in an election or vote; and
 (2)  the association counts every vote cast by a member
 that is eligible to cast a vote.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *