Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB873 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 873


 AN ACT
 relating to the courts authorized to hear certain matters relating
 to a capias pro fine.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 43.05, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  If the court that issued the capias pro fine is
 unavailable, the arresting officer may, in lieu of placing the
 defendant in jail, take the defendant to:
 (1)  another court in the same county with jurisdiction
 over Class A and Class B misdemeanors or a county criminal law
 magistrate court in the same county, if the court that issued the
 capias pro fine was a county court or a statutory county court with
 Class A and Class B misdemeanor jurisdiction; or
 (2)  another court in the same county with jurisdiction
 over felony cases or a county criminal law magistrate court in the
 same county, if the court that issued the capias pro fine was a
 district court with felony jurisdiction.
 SECTION 2.  Article 45.045, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  If the court that issued the capias pro fine is
 unavailable, the arresting officer may, in lieu of placing the
 defendant in jail, take the defendant to:
 (1)  a justice of the peace court or county criminal law
 magistrate court with jurisdiction over Class C misdemeanors that
 is located in the same county, if the court that issued the capias
 pro fine was a justice of the peace court; or
 (2)  a municipal court that is located in the same
 municipality, if the court that issued the capias pro fine was a
 municipal court.
 SECTION 3.  Article 45.046, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  For purposes of a hearing described by Subsection (a),
 if the court that issued the capias pro fine is unavailable, the
 following judicial officers may conduct the hearing:
 (1)  a justice of the peace or county criminal law
 magistrate with jurisdiction over Class C misdemeanors who is
 located in the same county as the issuing court, if the issuing
 court was a justice of the peace court; or
 (2)  a municipal court judge who is located in the same
 municipality as the issuing court, if the issuing court was a
 municipal court.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 873 passed the Senate on
 April 23, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 873 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor