Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB881 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2015

                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 881
 (Springer, Murphy)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the dedication of certain wine-related revenue.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 205.03, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (b), (c), (d), (e), (j), (n), and
 (p) and adding Subsection (n-1) to read as follows:
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 205.02, the following revenue
 may be appropriated for each state fiscal year only as specified by
 this section:
 (1)  the lesser of:
 (A)  the amount, if any, by which the amount of
 revenue derived from excise taxes on wine produced in a state other
 than Texas and any sales taxes collected from holders of
 out-of-state winery direct shipper's permits as a result of the
 passage of Senate Bill No. 877 by the 79th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2005, according to the most recent projection, as of the
 beginning of the fiscal year, by the comptroller for the fiscal year
 exceeds the amount of revenue from those sources for fiscal year
 2014 [2004], compounded annually for fiscal years 2015-2025
 [2005-2015] by the average percentage by which revenue from those
 sources increased from one fiscal year to the next between
 September 1, 2005 [1999], and August 31, 2013 [2003]; or
 (B)  $1 million; and
 (2)  the lesser of:
 (A)  the amount, if any, by which revenue derived
 from excise taxes on wine produced in this state and sales taxes
 remitted by holders of winery permits in this state, according to
 the most recent projection, as of the beginning of the fiscal year,
 by the comptroller for the fiscal year exceeds the amount of revenue
 from those sources for fiscal year 2014 [2004], compounded annually
 for fiscal years 2015-2025 [2005-2015] by the average percentage by
 which revenue from those sources increased from one fiscal year to
 the next between September 1, 2005 [1999], and August 31, 2013
 [2003]; or
 (B)  $1 million.
 (c)  Out of the amounts available under Subsections (b)(1) and
 (2) for a fiscal year, the lesser of $830,000 [$50,000] or the total
 amount available under those subdivisions may be appropriated only
 to [the] Texas A&M AgriLife [Cooperative] Extension Service [for
 extension viticulture operations].
 (d)  If the amount available for a fiscal year under
 Subsections (b)(1) and (2) exceeds $830,000 [$50,000], the lesser
 of $365,000 [$50,000] or the total amount available under those
 subdivisions may be appropriated only to the Texas Tech University
 Viticulture and Enology program [Agricultural Experiment Station
 for viticulture research].
 (e)  If the amount available for a fiscal year under
 Subsections (b)(1) and (2) exceeds $1,195,000 [$100,000], the
 lesser of the amount remaining under Subsection (b)(2) or $150,000
 [$65,000] may be appropriated only to the Texas Wine Marketing
 Research Institute at Texas Tech University.
 (j)  If the amount available for a fiscal year under
 Subsections (b)(1) and (2) exceeds the maximum amount that may be
 appropriated under Subsections (c), (d), and (e) [(c)-(g)], the
 lesser of the amount remaining under Subsections (b)(1) and (2) or
 $150,000 [$50,000] may be appropriated only for distribution to the
 T. V. Munson Viticulture and Enology Center of the [at] Grayson
 County Junior [Community] College District to fund educational
 programs [the associate degree program] at the center.
 (n)  If revenue [Revenue] derived under Subsection (b)(2) is
 [and] not otherwise appropriated under this section, the lesser of
 that remaining revenue or $300,000 [Subsections (c)-(k)] may be
 appropriated only for deposit into the wine industry development
 fund:
 (1)  for the development of technologies, strategies,
 and practices for mitigating or eliminating the effects of frost,
 pestilence, or infestation on grapevines for which money donated
 from private sources under Chapter 50B, Agriculture Code, is also
 spent; and
 (2)  in an amount that does not exceed the amount of the
 donated money described by Subdivision (1) that is spent for the
 same purposes [of increasing the economic impact of the Texas wine
 producing industry on the state].
 (n-1)  Any revenue available for a fiscal year under
 Subsection (b) that is not otherwise appropriated as authorized by
 this section may be appropriated only to the Department of
 Agriculture for deposit into the wine industry development fund
 for:
 (1)  the development of technologies, strategies, and
 practices for mitigating or eliminating the effects of frost,
 pestilence, or infestation on grapevines; and
 (2)  the department's direct and indirect costs
 associated with administering programs under Subsection (n) or
 Subdivision (1) of this subsection.
 (p)  This section expires September 1, 2025 [2015].
 SECTION 2.  Sections 205.03(a), (f), (g), (h), (i), (k),
 (l), (m), and (o), Alcoholic Beverage Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.