Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB888 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2015

                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 888
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2015; March 4, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 1; April 20, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 888 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appeal of waiver of jurisdiction and transfer to
 criminal court in juvenile cases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 4.18(g), Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (g)  This article does not apply to a claim of a defect or
 error in a discretionary transfer proceeding in juvenile court. A
 defendant may appeal a defect or error only as provided by Chapter
 56, Family Code [Article 44.47].
 SECTION 2.  Section 51.041(a), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The court retains jurisdiction over a person, without
 regard to the age of the person, for conduct engaged in by the
 person before becoming 17 years of age if, as a result of an appeal
 by the person or the state under Chapter 56 [or by the person under
 Article 44.47, Code of Criminal Procedure,] of an order of the
 court, the order is reversed or modified and the case remanded to
 the court by the appellate court.
 SECTION 3.  Section 56.01, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (h-1) to read as
 follows:
 (c)  An appeal may be taken:
 (1)  except as provided by Subsection (n), by or on
 behalf of a child from an order entered under:
 (A)  Section 54.02 respecting transfer of the
 child for prosecution as an adult;
 (B)  Section 54.03 with regard to delinquent
 conduct or conduct indicating a need for supervision;
 (C) [(B)]  Section 54.04 disposing of the case;
 (D) [(C)]  Section 54.05 respecting modification
 of a previous juvenile court disposition; or
 (E) [(D)]  Chapter 55 by a juvenile court
 committing a child to a facility for the mentally ill or
 intellectually disabled [mentally retarded]; or
 (2)  by a person from an order entered under Section
 54.11(i)(2) transferring the person to the custody of the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice.
 (h-1)  The supreme court shall adopt rules accelerating the
 disposition by the appellate court and the supreme court of an
 appeal of an order waiving jurisdiction under Section 54.02 and
 transferring a child to criminal court for prosecution.
 SECTION 4.  Article 44.47, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 5.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an order of a juvenile court waiving jurisdiction and
 transferring a child to criminal court that is issued on or after
 the effective date of this Act.  An order of a juvenile court
 waiving jurisdiction and transferring a child to criminal court
 that is issued before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law in effect on the date the order was issued, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *