Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB892 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/07/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger, West S.B. No. 892


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to educator preparation programs and teacher
 certification examinations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.0441, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read
 as follows:
 (a)  Rules of the board proposed under this subchapter must
 provide that a person, other than a person seeking career and
 technology education certification, is not eligible for admission
 to an educator preparation program, including an alternative
 educator preparation program, unless the person:
 (1)  except as provided by Subsection (b), satisfies
 the following minimum grade point average requirements [prescribed
 by the board, not to exceed the following]:
 (A)  an overall grade point average of at least
 2.50 [2.75] on a four-point scale or the equivalent on any course
 work previously attempted at a public or private institution of
 higher education; or
 (B)  a grade point average of at least 2.50 [2.75]
 on a four-point scale or the equivalent for the last 60 semester
 credit hours attempted at a public or private institution of higher
 education; and
 (2)  if the person is seeking initial certification:
 (A)  has successfully completed at least:
 (i)  15 semester credit hours in the
 subject-specific content area in which the person is seeking
 certification, if the person is seeking certification to teach
 mathematics or science at or above grade level seven; or
 (ii)  12 semester credit hours in the
 subject-specific content area in which the person is seeking
 certification, if the person is not seeking certification to teach
 mathematics or science at or above grade level seven; or
 (B)  has achieved a satisfactory level of
 performance on a content certification examination, which may be a
 content certification examination administered by a vendor
 approved by the commissioner for purposes of administering such an
 examination for the year for which the person is applying for
 admission to the program.
 (c)  The overall grade point average of each incoming class
 admitted by an educator preparation program, including an
 alternative educator preparation program, may not be less than 3.00
 on a four-point scale or the equivalent or a higher overall grade
 point average prescribed by the board. In computing the overall
 grade point average of an incoming class for purposes of this
 subsection, a program may:
 (1)  include the grade point average of each person in
 the incoming class based on all course work previously attempted by
 the person at a public or private institution of higher education;
 or
 (2)  include the grade point average of each person in
 the incoming class based only on the last 60 semester credit hours
 attempted by the person at a public or private institution of higher
 education.
 (d)  A person seeking career and technology education
 certification is not included in determining the overall grade
 point average of an incoming class under Subsection (c).
 SECTION 2.  Section 21.045(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  Each educator preparation program shall submit data
 elements as required by the board for an annual performance report
 to ensure access and equity.  At a minimum, the annual report must
 contain:
 (1)  the performance data from Subsection (a), other
 than the data required for purposes of Subsection (a)(3), and the
 following information, disaggregated by sex and ethnicity:
 (A) [(1)]  the number of candidates who apply;
 (B) [(2)]  the number of candidates admitted;
 (C) [(3)]  the number of candidates retained;
 (D) [(4)]  the number of candidates completing
 the program;
 (E) [(5)]  the number of candidates employed as
 beginning teachers under standard teaching certificates by not
 later than the first anniversary of [in the profession after]
 completing the program;
 (F)  the amount of time required by candidates
 employed as beginning teachers under probationary teaching
 certificates to be issued standard teaching certificates;
 (G) [(6)]  the number of candidates retained in
 the profession; and
 (H) [(7)]  any other information required by
 federal law;
 (2)  the ratio of field supervisors to candidates
 completing student teaching, clinical teaching, or an internship;
 and
 (3)  any other information necessary to enable the
 board to assess the effectiveness of the program on the basis of
 teacher retention and success criteria adopted by the board.
 SECTION 3.  Section 21.048, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a-1) and (c-1) and adding Subsection (a-2) to
 read as follows:
 (a-1)  The board may not require that more than 45 days
 elapse before a person may retake an examination. A person may not
 retake an examination more than four times, unless the board waives
 the limitation for good cause as prescribed by the board.
 (a-2)  For purposes of the limitation imposed by Subsection
 (a-1) on the number of administrations of an examination, a person
 who initially took an examination before September 1, 2015, may
 retake the examination up to four times after that date, regardless
 of the number of times that the person attempted to perform
 satisfactorily on the examination before that date. This
 subsection expires September 1, 2018.
 (c-1)  The results of an examination administered under this
 section are confidential and are not subject to disclosure under
 Chapter 552, Government Code, unless[:
 [(1)]  the disclosure is regarding notification to a
 parent of the assignment of an uncertified teacher to a classroom as
 required by Section 21.057[; or
 [(2)     the educator has failed the examination more than
 five times].
 SECTION 4.  Effective September 1, 2016, Section 21.051,
 Education Code, is amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding
 Subsections (b-1), (b-2), and (c-1) to read as follows:
 (b)  Before a school district may employ a candidate for
 certification as a teacher of record, the candidate must complete
 at least 30 [15] hours of field-based experience in which the
 candidate is actively engaged in instructional or educational
 activities in the classroom under supervision at:
 (1)  a public school campus accredited or approved for
 the purpose by the agency; or
 (2)  a private school recognized or approved for the
 purpose by the agency.
 (b-1)  The hours of field-based experience required by
 Subsection (b) may not be provided through use of electronic
 transmission or other video- or technology-based method.
 (b-2)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), a candidate may be
 employed by a school district as a teacher of record before
 completing the field-based experience required by that subsection
 if the candidate:
 (1)  is not admitted by an educator preparation program
 before June 15;
 (2)  is employed by the district on or after June 15 or
 after the district's school year begins; and
 (3)  completes the required field-based experience not
 later than the 90th day after the date the candidate receives a
 teaching assignment.
 (c-1)  Subsections (b), (b-1), and (b-2), as amended and
 added by S.B. 892, Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular Session,
 2015, apply only to an initial certification issued on or after
 September 1, 2016. Those provisions do not affect:
 (1)  the validity of a certification issued before
 September 1, 2016; or
 (2)  the eligibility of a person who holds a
 certification issued before September 1, 2016, to obtain a
 subsequent renewal of the certification in accordance with board
 rule.
 SECTION 5.  Not later than January 1, 2016, the State Board
 for Educator Certification shall develop criteria for evaluation of
 educator preparation programs based on teacher retention and
 success as required by Section 21.045(b)(3), Education Code, as
 added by this Act. The State Board for Educator Certification shall
 consult with the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board in
 developing the criteria, and the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board shall participate and provide recommendations
 regarding the criteria.
 SECTION 6.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.