Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB9 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/07/2015

                    By: Hancock, Birdwell, Creighton S.B. No. 9
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2015; March 10, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 7, 2015,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 5; April 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 9 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the constitutional limit on the rate of growth of
 appropriations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 316.001, 316.002, and 316.006,
 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 316.001.  LIMIT. (a)  For purposes of this subchapter,
 "consolidated general revenue appropriations" means appropriations
 from:
 (1)  the general revenue fund in the state treasury;
 (2)  a dedicated account in the general revenue fund in
 the state treasury; or
 (3)  a general revenue-related fund in the state
 treasury as identified in the biennial statement required of the
 comptroller under Section 49a, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 (b)  The rate of growth of consolidated general revenue
 appropriations in a state fiscal biennium [from state tax revenues
 not dedicated by the constitution] may not exceed the average
 biennial rate of growth of this state's population during the state
 fiscal biennium preceding the biennium for which appropriations are
 made and during the state fiscal biennium for which appropriations
 are made adjusted by the average biennial rate of monetary
 inflation in this state during the same period, as determined under
 Section 316.002 [estimated rate of growth of the state's economy].
 (c)  For purposes of this subchapter, an appropriation to pay
 for a rebate of state taxes must be excluded from computations used
 to determine whether appropriations exceed the amount authorized by
 Subsection (b).
 (d)  The Legislative Budget Board shall determine the rates
 described by Subsection (b) using the most recent information
 available from sources the board considers reliable, including the
 Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas and the Texas State Data Center.
 Sec. 316.002.  DUTIES OF LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD.
 (a)  Before the Legislative Budget Board transmits [submits] the
 budget for the next state fiscal biennium as prescribed by Section
 322.008(c), the board shall establish[:
 [(1)]  the limit on the rate of growth in consolidated
 general revenue appropriations for that state fiscal biennium, as
 compared to the previous state fiscal biennium, by subtracting one
 from the product of:
 (1)  the sum of one and the estimated average biennial
 rate of growth of this state's population during the state fiscal
 biennium preceding the biennium for which appropriations are made
 and during the state fiscal biennium for which appropriations are
 made; and
 (2)  the sum of one and the estimated average biennial
 rate of monetary inflation during the state fiscal biennium
 preceding the biennium for which appropriations are made and during
 the state fiscal biennium for which appropriations are made [the
 state's economy from the current biennium to the next biennium;
 [(2)     the level of appropriations for the current
 biennium from state tax revenues not dedicated by the constitution;
 and
 [(3)     the amount of state tax revenues not dedicated by
 the constitution that could be appropriated for the next biennium
 within the limit established by the estimated rate of growth of the
 state's economy].
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), the board shall
 determine for the next state fiscal biennium a limit on the amount
 of consolidated general revenue appropriations by multiplying the
 amount of consolidated general revenue appropriations for the then
 current state fiscal biennium by the sum of one and the limit on the
 rate of growth of consolidated general revenue appropriations
 determined by the board under Subsection (a) [the estimated rate of
 growth of the state's economy by dividing the estimated Texas total
 personal income for the next biennium by the estimated Texas total
 personal income for the current biennium.    Using standard
 statistical methods, the board shall make the estimate by
 projecting through the biennium the estimated Texas total personal
 income reported by the United States Department of Commerce or its
 successor in function].
 (c)  If the rate determined under Subsection (a) is a
 negative number, the amount of consolidated general revenue
 appropriations for the next state fiscal biennium may not exceed
 the amount of consolidated general revenue appropriations in the
 current state fiscal biennium [If a more comprehensive definition
 of the rate of growth of the state's economy is developed and is
 approved by the committee established by Section 316.005, the board
 may use that definition in calculating the limit on
 appropriations].
 (d)  To ensure compliance with Section 22, Article VIII,
 [Section 22, of the] Texas Constitution, the Legislative Budget
 Board may not transmit in any form to the governor or the
 legislature the budget as prescribed by Section 322.008(c) or the
 general appropriations bill as prescribed by Section 322.008(d)
 until the limit on the rate of growth of appropriations has been
 adopted as required by this subchapter.
 (e)  In the absence of an action by the Legislative Budget
 Board to adopt a [spending] limit on consolidated general revenue
 appropriations as provided by this section, [in Subsections (a) and
 (b), the estimated rate of growth in the state's economy from the
 current biennium to the next biennium shall be treated as if it were
 zero, and] the amount of consolidated general revenue
 appropriations available for the next state fiscal biennium [state
 tax revenues not dedicated by the constitution that could be
 appropriated] within the limit established by this section is [the
 estimated rate of growth in the state's economy shall be] the same
 as the amount [level] of consolidated general revenue
 appropriations for the current state fiscal biennium.
 Sec. 316.006.  LIMIT ON BUDGET RECOMMENDATIONS. Unless
 authorized by majority vote of the members of the board from each
 house, the Legislative Budget Board budget recommendations
 relating to the proposed consolidated general revenue
 appropriations [of state tax revenues not dedicated by the
 constitution] may not exceed the limit adopted by the committee
 under Section 316.005.
 SECTION 2.  Section 316.007(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The Legislative Budget Board shall include in its budget
 recommendations the proposed limit on consolidated general revenue
 [of] appropriations [from state tax revenues not dedicated by the
 constitution].
 SECTION 3.  Section 316.008(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Unless the legislature adopts a resolution under
 Section 22, Article VIII, [Section 22(b), of the] Texas
 Constitution, raising the proposed limit on consolidated general
 revenue appropriations, the proposed limit is binding on the
 legislature with respect to all consolidated general revenue
 appropriations for the next state fiscal biennium [made from state
 tax revenues not dedicated by the constitution].
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only,
 as applicable, in relation to appropriations made for the state
 fiscal biennium beginning September 1, 2017, and subsequent state
 fiscal bienniums.  Appropriations for the state fiscal biennium
 that begins September 1, 2015, are governed by Sections 316.001,
 316.002, 316.006, 316.007, and 316.008, Government Code, as those
 sections existed on December 1, 2014, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect on the date on which the
 constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2015, concerning the limitation on the rate of growth in
 appropriations takes effect.  If that amendment is not approved by
 the voters, this Act has no effect.
 * * * * *