Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB902 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Taylor of Collin S.B. No. 902
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2015; March 9, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 15, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disclosure of certain public information by a
 public school district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 552, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 552.030 to read as follows:
 Sec. 552.030.  REQUESTS FOR INFORMATION MADE TO SCHOOL
 DISTRICTS. (a)  The control files of a database used by a school
 district to record financial information, or an analogous component
 that records the physical structure of the district's database, are
 public information subject to disclosure under this chapter.
 (b)  A school district shall cooperate with a requestor to
 provide information requested under this chapter in the most
 efficient and cost-effective manner practicable.
 (c)  This section does not require the disclosure of
 information for which an employee declines public access under
 Section 552.024 or of information made confidential under Section
 552.135 or 552.147.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a request for public information made on or after the effective
 date of this Act.  A request for public information made before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date of the request, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *