Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB904 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 904
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2015; March 9, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 22, 2015,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0;
 April 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to exempting emergency preparation supplies from the sales
 and use tax for a limited period.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 151.3565 to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.3565.  EMERGENCY PREPARATION SUPPLIES FOR LIMITED
 PERIOD. (a)  The sale of an emergency preparation item is exempted
 from the taxes imposed by this chapter if the sale takes place
 during a period beginning at 12:01 a.m. on the Saturday before the
 last Monday in April and ending at 12 midnight on the last Monday in
 April.
 (b)  For purposes of this section, "emergency preparation
 item" means:
 (1)  a portable generator used to provide light or
 communications or to preserve perishable food in the event of a
 power outage, the sales price of which is less than $3,000;
 (2)  an item listed in this subdivision, the sales
 price of which is less than $300:
 (A)  a storm protection device manufactured,
 rated, and marketed specifically to prevent damage to a glazed or
 non-glazed opening during a storm; or
 (B)  an emergency or rescue ladder; or
 (3)  an item listed in this subdivision, the sales
 price of which is less than $75:
 (A)  a reusable or artificial ice product;
 (B)  a portable, self-powered light source;
 (C)  a gasoline or diesel fuel container;
 (D)  a AAA cell, AA cell, C cell, D cell, 6 volt,
 or 9 volt battery, or a package containing more than one battery,
 other than an automobile or boat battery;
 (E)  a nonelectric cooler or ice chest for food
 storage;
 (F)  a tarpaulin or other flexible waterproof
 sheeting;
 (G)  a ground anchor system or tie-down kit;
 (H)  a mobile telephone battery or battery
 charger;
 (I)  a portable self-powered radio, including a
 two-way radio or weatherband radio;
 (J)  a fire extinguisher, smoke detector, or
 carbon monoxide detector;
 (K)  a hatchet or axe;
 (L)  a self-contained first aid kit; or
 (M)  a nonelectric can opener.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect taxes imposed before the effective date of this Act, and the
 law in effect before the effective date of this Act is continued in
 effect for purposes of the liability for and collection of those
 taxes.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *