Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB914 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 31, 2015      TO: Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB914 by Kolkhorst (Relating to a council on long-term care facility surveys and informal dispute resolution.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would create a council on long-term care facility surveys and informal dispute resolution. The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to establish the council, which includes employees of the Department of Aging and Disability Services (DADS), no later than December 1, 2015. The bill requires the council to submit a report by January 1, 2017, on the council's findings and recommendations to the HHSC executive commissioner, the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house, and the chairs of the appropriate legislative committees. The bill would expire on June 1, 2017. HHSC and DADS indicate that the provisions of the bill can be implemented within existing resources. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:529 Health and Human Services Commission, 539 Aging and Disability Services, Department of   LBB Staff:  UP, NB, CH, LR    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 31, 2015





  TO: Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB914 by Kolkhorst (Relating to a council on long-term care facility surveys and informal dispute resolution.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB914 by Kolkhorst (Relating to a council on long-term care facility surveys and informal dispute resolution.), As Introduced

 Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB914 by Kolkhorst (Relating to a council on long-term care facility surveys and informal dispute resolution.), As Introduced

SB914 by Kolkhorst (Relating to a council on long-term care facility surveys and informal dispute resolution.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would create a council on long-term care facility surveys and informal dispute resolution. The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to establish the council, which includes employees of the Department of Aging and Disability Services (DADS), no later than December 1, 2015. The bill requires the council to submit a report by January 1, 2017, on the council's findings and recommendations to the HHSC executive commissioner, the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house, and the chairs of the appropriate legislative committees. The bill would expire on June 1, 2017. HHSC and DADS indicate that the provisions of the bill can be implemented within existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 539 Aging and Disability Services, Department of

529 Health and Human Services Commission, 539 Aging and Disability Services, Department of

LBB Staff: UP, NB, CH, LR

 UP, NB, CH, LR