Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB914 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/20/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 914


 AN ACT
 relating to a council on long-term care facility surveys and
 informal dispute resolution.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
 (1)  "Council" means the Long-Term Care Facility Survey
 and Informal Dispute Resolution Council established under this Act.
 (2)  "Executive commissioner" means the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission.
 (3)  "Long-term care facility" means a facility subject
 to regulation under Section 32.021(d), Human Resources Code, or
 Chapter 242, 247, or 252, Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 2.  COUNCIL ESTABLISHED; MEMBERSHIP; OFFICERS.
 (a)  Not later than December 1, 2015, the executive commissioner
 shall establish a Long-Term Care Facility Survey and Informal
 Dispute Resolution Council.  The council is composed of the
 following members appointed by the executive commissioner:
 (1)  two program managers from different Department of
 Aging and Disability Services regions;
 (2)  one surveyor who has attained at least the level of
 investigator IV;
 (3)  two members of an enforcement team from different
 Department of Aging and Disability Services regions;
 (4)  three surveyors, each from a different Department
 of Aging and Disability Services region, at least one of whom must
 have a background in nursing, at least one of whom must have a
 background in social work, and at least one of whom must have a
 background in the provision of pharmacy services;
 (5)  one informal dispute resolution team leader;
 (6)  one informal dispute resolution reviewer;
 (7)  two owners or regional vice presidents of
 operation who oversee multiple long-term care facilities;
 (8)  two regional quality assurance nurses who oversee
 multiple long-term care facilities;
 (9)  two active long-term care facility
 administrators; and
 (10)  two active long-term care facility directors of
 nursing.
 (b)  The executive commissioner shall designate a member of
 the council to serve as presiding officer. The members of the
 council shall elect any other necessary officers.
 (c)  A member of the council serves at the will of the
 executive commissioner.
 SECTION 3.  MEETINGS.  The council shall meet at the call of
 the executive commissioner.
 SECTION 4.  REIMBURSEMENT OR COMPENSATION NOT AUTHORIZED.  A
 member of the council is not entitled to reimbursement of expenses
 or to compensation for service on the council.
 SECTION 5.  GIFTS OR GRANTS.  The council may accept gifts
 and grants from any source to be used to carry out a function of the
 council.
 SECTION 6.  DUTIES OF COUNCIL. (a)  The council shall study
 and make recommendations regarding a consistent survey and informal
 dispute resolution process for long-term care facilities.
 (b)  The council shall:
 (1)  study and make recommendations regarding best
 practices and protocols to make survey, inspection, and informal
 dispute resolution processes more efficient and less burdensome on
 long-term care facilities; and
 (2)  recommend uniform standards for those processes.
 SECTION 7.  REPORT.  Not later than January 1, 2017, the
 council shall submit a report on the council's findings and
 recommendations required by this Act to the executive commissioner,
 the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and the chairs of the appropriate legislative
 committees.
 SECTION 8.  APPLICATION OF CERTAIN LAW.  Chapter 2110,
 Government Code, does not apply to the council.
 SECTION 9.  EXPIRATION. This Act expires June 1, 2017.
 SECTION 10.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 914 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 914 passed the House on
 May 19, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 145, Nays 1, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor