Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB917 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 917
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2015; March 9, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 7, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0, 1 present not voting; April 7, 2015, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of the Texas Mass Gatherings Act to
 certain horse and greyhound races.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 751, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 751.0021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 751.0021.  APPLICABILITY TO CERTAIN HORSE AND GREYHOUND
 RACES.  (a)  This chapter applies to a horse or greyhound race that
 attracts or is expected to attract at least 100 persons, except that
 this chapter does not apply if the race is held at a location at
 which pari-mutuel wagering is authorized under the Texas Racing Act
 (Article 179e, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes).
 (b)  This section does not legalize any activity prohibited
 under the Penal Code or other state law.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *