Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB925 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2015

                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 925
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2015; March 9, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 20, 2015,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 925 By:  Kolkhorst


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to providing training academies for public school teachers
 who provide reading instruction to students in kindergarten through
 grade five.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter J, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.4552 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.4552.  TEACHER LITERACY ACHIEVEMENT ACADEMIES.
 (a)  The commissioner shall develop and make available literacy
 achievement academies for teachers who provide:
 (1)  reading instruction to students at the
 kindergarten or first, second, or third grade level; and
 (2)  reading comprehension instruction to students at
 the fourth or fifth grade level.
 (b)  A literacy achievement academy developed under this
 section:
 (1)  must include training in:
 (A)  effective and systematic instructional
 practices in reading, including phonemic awareness, phonics,
 fluency, vocabulary, and comprehension; and
 (B)  the use of empirically validated
 instructional methods that are appropriate for struggling readers;
 and
 (2)  may include training in effective instructional
 practices in writing.
 (c)  The commissioner shall adopt criteria for selecting
 teachers who may attend a literacy achievement academy. In
 adopting selection criteria under this subsection, the
 commissioner shall require granting a priority to teachers employed
 by a school district at a campus at which 50 percent or more of the
 students enrolled are educationally disadvantaged.
 (d)  From funds appropriated for that purpose, a teacher who
 attends a literacy achievement academy is entitled to receive a
 stipend in the amount determined by the commissioner.  A stipend
 received under this subsection is not considered in determining
 whether a school district is paying the teacher the minimum monthly
 salary under Section 21.402.
 (e)  On request of the commissioner, regional education
 service centers shall assist the commissioner and agency with
 training and other activities relating to the development and
 operation of literacy achievement academies.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *