Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB93 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2015

                    By: Ellis S.B. No. 93
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2014; January 26, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 May 18, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 18, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 93 By:  Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the suspension of a driver's license for failure to pay
 a surcharge.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 708.151(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  If on or before the 45th day after the date the first
 notice was sent the person fails to pay the amount of the surcharge
 or fails to enter into an installment payment agreement with the
 department, the department shall send a second notice.  [If on or
 before the 60th day after the date the second notice was sent the
 person fails to pay the amount of the surcharge or fails to enter
 into an installment payment agreement with the department, the
 department shall send a third notice that advises the person that
 the person's driving privileges are suspended.]
 SECTION 2.  Section 708.154, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 708.154.  CREDIT CARD PAYMENT OF SURCHARGE. [(a)]  The
 department by rule may authorize the payment of a surcharge by use
 of a credit card. The rules shall require the person to pay all
 costs incurred by the department in connection with the acceptance
 of the credit card.
 [(b)     If a surcharge or a related cost is paid by credit card
 and the amount is subsequently reversed by the issuer of the credit
 card, the license of the person is automatically suspended.
 [(c)     A license suspended under this section remains
 suspended until the person pays the amount of the surcharge and any
 related costs.]
 SECTION 3.  Section 708.152, Transportation Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *