Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB935 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2015

                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 935
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2015; March 9, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 20, 2015,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 935 By:  Kolkhorst


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a reading excellence team pilot
 program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.0061 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.0061.  READING EXCELLENCE TEAM PILOT PROGRAM.
 (a)  Using funds appropriated for that purpose, the commissioner
 shall establish a reading excellence team pilot program in
 accordance with this section.
 (b)  A school district is eligible to participate in the
 pilot program if, as determined by the commissioner, the district
 has low student performance on:
 (1)  a reading instrument administered in accordance
 with Section 28.006(c); or
 (2)  a third grade reading assessment instrument
 administered under Section 39.023(a).
 (c)  The pilot program must:
 (1)  establish reading excellence teams composed of
 reading instruction specialists;
 (2)  allow an eligible school district to request the
 assistance of a reading excellence team; and
 (3)  provide a reading excellence team to a requesting
 eligible school district to:
 (A)  review with the district the results of the
 assessments described under Subsection (b) to determine campuses
 and classrooms for kindergarten through third grade with the
 greatest need of assistance; and
 (B)  work with teachers on campuses and in
 classrooms identified under Paragraph (A) to provide training
 necessary to improve student reading outcomes.
 (d)  The commissioner shall adopt rules to administer this
 section, including rules establishing qualifications and criteria
 for selecting reading instruction specialists for a reading
 excellence team.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  The commissioner of education shall establish
 the pilot program under Section 28.0061, Education Code, as added
 by this Act, not later than September 1, 2016.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *