S.B. No. 935 AN ACT relating to the establishment of a reading excellence team pilot program. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 28.0061 to read as follows: Sec. 28.0061. READING EXCELLENCE TEAM PILOT PROGRAM. (a) Using funds appropriated for that purpose, the commissioner shall establish a reading excellence team pilot program in accordance with this section. (b) A school district is eligible to participate in the pilot program if, as determined by the commissioner, the district has low student performance on: (1) a reading instrument administered in accordance with Section 28.006(c); or (2) a third grade reading assessment instrument administered under Section 39.023(a). (c) The pilot program must: (1) establish reading excellence teams composed of reading instruction specialists; (2) allow an eligible school district to request the assistance of a reading excellence team; and (3) provide a reading excellence team to a requesting eligible school district to: (A) review with the district the results of the assessments described under Subsection (b) to determine campuses and classrooms for kindergarten through third grade with the greatest need of assistance; and (B) work with teachers on campuses and in classrooms identified under Paragraph (A) to provide training necessary to improve student reading outcomes. (d) The commissioner shall adopt rules to administer this section, including rules establishing qualifications and criteria for selecting reading instruction specialists for a reading excellence team. (e) This section expires September 1, 2021. SECTION 2. The commissioner of education shall establish the pilot program under Section 28.0061, Education Code, as added by this Act, not later than September 1, 2016. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 935 passed the Senate on April 23, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 935 passed the House on May 23, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 128, Nays 11, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor