Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB970 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/30/2015

                    By: Perry S.B. No. 970
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2015; March 10, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water, and
 Rural Affairs; March 30, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 March 30, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 970 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the failure to handle certain animals in accordance
 with rules of the Texas Animal Health Commission; amending
 provisions subject to a criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 161.041(c), Agriculture Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  A person commits an offense if the person knowingly
 fails to handle, in accordance with rules adopted by the
 commission, livestock, exotic livestock, domestic fowl, or exotic
 fowl:
 (1)  infected with a disease listed in Subsection (a);
 (2)  exposed, as defined by commission rule, to a
 disease listed in Subsection (a) if the commission has notified the
 person that the animal was exposed to the disease; or
 (3)  subject to a testing requirement due to a risk of
 exposure, as defined by commission rule, to a specific disease if
 the commission has notified the person of the testing requirement.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *