Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB972 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 972
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2015; March 10, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 16, 2015,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 16, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 972 By:  Kolkhorst


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to training academies for public school teachers who
 provide reading comprehension instruction to students in grades
 four and five.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter J, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.4554 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.4554.  READING-TO-LEARN ACADEMIES. (a)  The
 commissioner shall develop and make available reading-to-learn
 academies for teachers who provide reading comprehension
 instruction to students at the fourth or fifth grade level.
 (b)  A reading-to-learn academy developed under this
 section:
 (1)  must include effective instructional practices
 that promote student development of reading comprehension and
 inferential and critical thinking;
 (2)  must provide training in the use of empirically
 validated instructional methods that are appropriate for
 struggling readers;
 (3)  may include material on writing instruction; and
 (4)  must provide participating teachers with access to
 the academy training materials through the Internet after the
 teachers attend the academy.
 (c)  The commissioner shall adopt criteria for selecting
 teachers who may attend a reading-to-learn academy. In adopting
 selection criteria under this subsection, the commissioner shall
 require granting a priority to teachers employed by a school
 district at a campus at which 50 percent or more of the students
 enrolled are educationally disadvantaged.
 (d)  From funds appropriated for that purpose, a teacher who
 attends a reading-to-learn academy is entitled to receive a stipend
 in the amount determined by the commissioner. A stipend received
 under this subsection is not considered in determining whether a
 district is paying the teacher the minimum monthly salary under
 Section 21.402.
 (e)  On request of the commissioner, regional education
 service centers shall assist the commissioner and agency with
 training and other activities relating to the development and
 operation of reading-to-learn academies.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *