Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB972 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/25/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 972


 AN ACT
 relating to training academies for public school teachers who
 provide reading comprehension instruction to students in grades
 four and five.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter J, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.4554 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.4554.  READING-TO-LEARN ACADEMIES. (a)  The
 commissioner shall develop and make available reading-to-learn
 academies for teachers who provide reading comprehension
 instruction to students at the fourth or fifth grade level.
 (b)  A reading-to-learn academy developed under this
 section:
 (1)  must include effective instructional practices
 that promote student development of reading comprehension and
 inferential and critical thinking;
 (2)  must provide training in the use of empirically
 validated instructional methods that are appropriate for
 struggling readers;
 (3)  may include material on writing instruction; and
 (4)  must provide participating teachers with access to
 the academy training materials through the Internet after the
 teachers attend the academy.
 (c)  The commissioner shall adopt criteria for selecting
 teachers who may attend a reading-to-learn academy. In adopting
 selection criteria under this subsection, the commissioner shall:
 (1)  require granting a priority to teachers employed
 by a school district at a campus at which 50 percent or more of the
 students enrolled are educationally disadvantaged; and
 (2)  provide a process through which a teacher not
 employed at a campus described by Subdivision (1) may attend the
 academy if the academy has available space and the school district
 employing the teacher pays the costs of the teacher's attendance.
 (d)  From funds appropriated for that purpose, a teacher who
 attends a reading-to-learn academy is entitled to receive a stipend
 in the amount determined by the commissioner. A stipend received
 under this subsection is not considered in determining whether a
 district is paying the teacher the minimum monthly salary under
 Section 21.402.
 (e)  On request of the commissioner, regional education
 service centers shall assist the commissioner and agency with
 training and other activities relating to the development and
 operation of reading-to-learn academies.
 (f)  This section expires September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 972 passed the Senate on
 April 23, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 972 passed the House on
 May 23, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 103, Nays 37,
 one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor