Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB979 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/04/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 979


 AN ACT
 relating to individual indemnity health insurance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1201.104(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  For individual accident and health insurance policies,
 the commissioner shall adopt rules establishing minimum standards
 for benefits under each of the following categories of coverage:
 (1)  basic hospital expense;
 (2)  basic medical-surgical expense;
 (3)  hospital [confinement] indemnity or other fixed
 indemnity;
 (4)  major medical expense;
 (5)  disability income protection;
 (6)  accident only;
 (7)  specified disease;
 (8)  specified accident; and
 (9)  limited benefit.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2016, the commissioner
 of insurance shall adopt any rules necessary to implement Section
 1201.104, Insurance Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 979 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 979 passed the House on
 April 30, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 136, Nays 3, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor