Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB991 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/25/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 991


 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that the General Land Office conduct a
 study regarding the use of wind or solar power to desalinate
 brackish groundwater.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITIONS.  In this Act:
 (1)  "Development board" means the Texas Water
 Development Board.
 (2)  "Land office" means the General Land Office.
 SECTION 2.  STUDY.  (a)  The land office in consultation
 with the development board shall conduct a study regarding the use
 of wind or solar power to desalinate brackish groundwater on real
 property owned by the state.
 (b)  The land office and the development board may request
 data from any state agency in conducting the study.  An agency
 receiving a request under this subsection shall provide the
 requested data.
 (c)  The land office may coordinate with a research division
 of a university in conducting the study.
 SECTION 3.  REPORT.  (a)  Not later than December 31, 2016,
 the land office shall report the results of the study conducted
 under this Act to the governor and the legislature.
 (b)  The report described by this section may not disclose
 information that is excepted from the requirements of Section
 552.021, Government Code.
 SECTION 4.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 991 passed the Senate on
 April 22, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 991 passed the House on
 May 22, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 133, Nays 7, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor