Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR20 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/27/2015

                    By: Watson S.J.R. No. 20
 (In the Senate - Filed January 7, 2015; February 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 April 27, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 12, Nays 0; April 27, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.J.R. No. 20 By:  Watson


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the governing
 body of a political subdivision other than a school district to
 adopt an exemption from ad valorem taxation of a portion, expressed
 as a dollar amount, of the market value of an individual's residence
 homestead.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1-b, Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 is amended by adding Subsections (n), (o), and (p) to read as
 follows:
 (n)  The governing body of a political subdivision other than
 a school district by official action may exempt from ad valorem
 taxation a portion of the market value of the residence homestead of
 an individual. The amount of the exemption is $5,000 unless a
 larger amount is specified by the governing body authorizing the
 exemption. Where ad valorem tax has previously been pledged for the
 payment of debt, the governing body may continue to levy and collect
 the tax against the value of the homesteads exempted under this
 subsection until the debt is discharged if the cessation of the levy
 would impair the obligation of the contract by which the debt was
 created.
 (o)  This subsection applies only to a political subdivision
 to which Subsection (n) of this section applies the governing body
 of which has not adopted an exemption under Subsection (e) of this
 section. An individual is entitled to an exemption from ad valorem
 taxation by the political subdivision under Subsection (n) of this
 section as if the exemption were adopted by the governing body under
 that subsection unless the governing body by official action elects
 not to adopt an exemption under that subsection. The amount of the
 exemption is $5,000 unless the governing body authorizes an
 exemption in a larger amount as provided by Subsection (n) of this
 section.
 (p)  This subsection applies only to a political subdivision
 the governing body of which has ceased granting an exemption under
 Subsection (e) of this section and has adopted an exemption under
 Subsection (n) of this section. An individual who would have been
 entitled to an exemption from ad valorem taxation by the political
 subdivision under Subsection (e) of this section had the governing
 body not ceased granting an exemption under that subsection is
 entitled to continue to receive an exemption under that subsection
 in lieu of the exemption under Subsection (n) of this section if the
 individual otherwise qualifies for the exemption under Subsection
 (e) of this section and the amount of the exemption under that
 subsection as calculated under this subsection exceeds the amount
 of the exemption under Subsection (n) of this section. The
 exemption applies only to property for which the individual
 received an exemption under Subsection (e) of this section in the
 last tax year in which the governing body granted an exemption under
 that subsection. Notwithstanding Subsection (e) of this section,
 the amount of the exemption is the dollar amount of the exemption
 that the individual received under that subsection in the last tax
 year in which the governing body granted an exemption under that
 subsection.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2015, authorizing the governing body of a
 political subdivision other than a school district to adopt an
 exemption from ad valorem taxation of a portion, expressed as a
 dollar amount, of the market value of an individual's residence
 homestead.
 (b)  The amendments to Section 1-b, Article VIII, of this
 constitution take effect beginning with the tax year that begins
 January 1, 2016.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the
 governing body of a political subdivision other than a school
 district to adopt an exemption from ad valorem taxation of a
 portion, expressed as a dollar amount, of the market value of an
 individual's residence homestead."
 * * * * *